WARWICKSHIRE POLICE COMMUNITY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DONATIONS TO VICTIMS WHO SUFFER FINANCIAL HARDSHIP FOLLOWING A CRIME. ALSO HELP LOCAL COMMUNITY VENTURES WITHIN THE COUNTY OF WARWICKSHIRE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 11 February 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Franklin-Smith | Chair | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lee Kemp | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Simpkins | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Caroline Plane | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Coleman Mr | Trustee | 13 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Grasby | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA ANN WILLIAMS-YEAGERS | Trustee | 09 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY NORMAN CARRUTHERS | Trustee | 09 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN BRIAN MARTIN | Trustee | 09 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.31k | £9.59k | £41.13k | £91 | £20.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.70k | £32.21k | £33.09k | £10.04k | £27.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 09 AUG 2018
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR: 1.RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL NEED 2.EDUCATION OR ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ANY PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITY 3.THE TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF ILLNESS AND DISEASE 4.FOR THE APPROPRIATE SUPPORT OF VICTIMS CRIME AND CRIME PREVENTION IN THE COMMUNITY 5.FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE COUNTY OF WARWICKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Warwickshire Police
Woodcote Drive
Leek Wootton
WARWICK
CV35 7QA
- Phone:
- 01926415726
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window