BELGRAVE HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in all matters relating to the history and heritage of the Belgrave Old Village in Leicestershire with particular regard to the history and heritage of the places of worship or former places of worship existing or formerly existing within the Belgrave Old Village, including the historic former St Peter's Parish Church building at Church Road.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicester City
Governance
- 29 November 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bishop RICHARD CHARLES NORBURN | Chair | 29 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Sandra Eileen Moore | Trustee | 11 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Dixey | Trustee | 11 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Warren | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN JOYCE HINDOCHA | Trustee | 29 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
NICK FATHERS | Trustee | 29 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.82k | £946 | £1.76k | £1.91k | £2.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.36k | £1.50k | £1.43k | £2.94k | £1.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £499 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 29 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE CIO EXISTS FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS. THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT: (1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF THE BELGRAVE OLD VILLAGE IN LEICESTERSHIRE WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF THE PLACES OF WORSHIP OR FORMER PLACES OF WORSHIP EXISTING OR FORMERLY EXISTING WITHIN THE BELGRAVE OLD VILLAGE INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION AS TO THE GENERALITY OF THE AFOREMENTIONED) THE HISTORIC FORMER PARISH CHURCH PREMISES AT CHURCH ROAD AND THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF THE PEOPLE, SOCIAL-COMMUNITIES, FAITH-COMMUNITIES AND EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS ASSOCIATED WITH SUCH PLACES OF WORSHIP (2)TO PRESERVE, REPAIR, MAINTAIN AND ENHANCE OR TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE AND ENHANCEMENT OF LAND AND STRUCTURES OF HISTORIC, ARCHITECTURAL, ARCHAEOLOGICAL OR ENVIRONMENTAL VALUE SITUATE WITHIN THE BELGRAVE OLD VILLAGE (AND OF FLORA, FEATURES, BUILDINGS, SITES OR OBJECTS UPON OR WITHIN SUCH LAND OR STRUCTURES) WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO THE PLACES OF WORSHIP OR FORMER PLACES OF WORSHIP EXISTING WITHIN THE BELGRAVE OLD VILLAGE INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION AS TO THE GENERALITY OF THE AFOREMENTIONED) THE HISTORIC FORMER PARISH CHURCH BUILDING SITUATE AT CHURCH ROAD TOGETHER WITH ITS CONTENTS, OUTBUILDINGS, BURIAL GROUNDS AND CURTILAGE (SUCH LAND AND STRUCTURES BEING HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "THE HERITAGE LAND AND STRUCTURES" (3)TO PROVIDE OR TO SECURE THE PROVISION UPON, WITHIN OR NEAR THE HERITAGE LAND AND STRUCTURES (OR ANY PART THEREOF) OF FACILITIES FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE OBJECTS REFERRED TO IN SUB-CLAUSE (1) OF THIS CLAUSE (4)TO BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF THE BELGRAVE DISTRICT OF LEICESTER AND OF THE RESIDENTS OF LEICESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS AND THE PUBLIC GENERALLY BY PROVIDING UPON, WITHIN OR NEAR THE HERITAGE LAND AND STRUCTURES (OR ANY PART THEREOF) FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR RESIDENTS AND FOR THE PUBLIC GENERALLY (5)GENERALLY TO FACILITATE AND ENCOURAGE USE OF THE HERITAGE LAND AND STRUCTURES (OR ANY PART THEREOF) FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES (6)AT THE DISCRETION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES OF THE CIO, TO FURTHER OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES INCIDENTAL OR ANCILLARY TO THE PURPOSES STATED ABOVE (OR ANY OF THEM).
Contact information
- Address:
-
74 SANDRINGHAM AVENUE
LEICESTER
LE4 7NR
- Phone:
- 01162666531
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window