Financial history SIDDIQUI EDUCATIONAL DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity Number: 1182837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £584 £11.56k £9.39k £12.17k £11.77k
Total expenditure £2.03k £5.94k £5.61k £14.07k £10.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A