Accounts and annual returns SUTTON NURSERY SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 512931
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2017 02 July 2018 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 July 2018 2 days late
Annual return 31 August 2016 05 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 05 May 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2015 12 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 12 November 2015 On Time