Financial history SUTTON NURSERY SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 512931
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £170.69k £202.09k £188.10k £183.02k £183.02k
Total expenditure £189.78k £188.03k £192.09k £180.35k £182.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0