NKURINGO EDUCATION AND COMMUNITY SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NECS: - provides grants, items and services to prevent or relieve poverty in Nkuringo, SW Uganda - provides and assists in the provision of facilities to advance the education of the pupils attending primary and secondary schools in Nkuringo - provides financial support and assistance in the relief of sickness and preservation of health in Nkuringo.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 18 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Uganda
Governance
- 28 January 2019: CIO registration
- THE NKURINGO EDUCATION AND COMMUNITY SUPPORT PROGRAMME (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tara Garritt BA MSc | Chair | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Leone Mellor | Trustee | 23 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Carole Knight BSc MSc | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Carol Duchesne | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Louise Bishop BEd. QTS. | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 18/01/2020 | 18/01/2021 | 18/01/2022 | 18/01/2023 | 18/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.07k | £67.84k | £73.72k | £77.20k | £153.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.95k | £67.37k | £71.07k | £79.67k | £134.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 January 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 January 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 January 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 January 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 January 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 January 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 January 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 January 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 January 2020 | 15 September 2021 | 301 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 January 2020 | 15 September 2021 | 301 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Jan 2019 as amended on 21 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
1) The prevention or relief of poverty in Nkuringo, South West Uganda by providing: grants, items and services to individuals in need and/or charities, or other organisations working to prevent or relieve poverty. 2) To advance the education of the pupils attending both the primary and secondary schools in Nkuringo, South West Uganda by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities for education at the schools and by providing sponsorship to students who would not otherwise be able to afford to attend school 3) The relief of sickness and the preservation of health among people residing permanently or temporarily or in Nkuringo, South West Uganda, through the provision of financial support or assisting in the provision of facilities for health care.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Winslow Road
Little Horwood
Milton Keynes
MK17 0PD
- Phone:
- 07711 025780
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window