DEBRE-GENET HOLY TRINITY ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Debre Genet Holy Trinity E.O.T.Church is an Ecclesiastical Charitable Trust and it has been providing spiritual and other important services to the community. It is a focal place where children and young adults are shaped to become better citizens, a place where those that face difficulties in life turn for help through the pastoral care provided by the clergies and fellow members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 November 2018: CIO registration
- 29 November 2024: Funds received from 1124941 DEBRE-GENET HOLY TRINITY ETHIOPIAN ORTHODOX TEWAHE...
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev KEFEYALEW ASCHALEW | Chair | 02 April 2017 |
|
|||||||
Rev Addis Gebrekidan | Trustee | 21 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Melaku Abay | Trustee | 14 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Beshewalay Feyissa | Trustee | 14 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Estifanos Belew | Trustee | 14 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Kibret Asnakew | Trustee | 02 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Fisseha Teferi | Trustee | 02 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Samuel Wodajo | Trustee | 02 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £294.52k | £209.32k | £314.44k | £387.64k | £479.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.00k | £107.17k | £146.39k | £156.22k | £295.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 December 2022 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 December 2022 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
1.TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEF IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 2.TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; AND 3.TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Debre-Genet Holy Trinity EOTC
St. Michaels Road
LONDON
NW2 6XG
- Phone:
- 07341339751
- Email:
- office@dght.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window