GLOUCESTERSHIRE SQUASH ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the amateur sports of squash and racket ball.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 November 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ewen Denning | Chair | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Hession | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARK TOSELAND | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAN HEATON | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALEX PARKER | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.33k | £2.22k | £19.54k | £11.79k | £6.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.47k | £4.83k | £8.79k | £7.08k | £7.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 02 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 02 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 15 September 2024 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 15 September 2024 | 168 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 11 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 11 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 07 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF SQUASH AND SQUASH 57 FORMALLY KNOWN AS RACKET BALL. THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ENCOURAGING AND FACILITATING PARTICIPATION IN THE SPORTS OF SQUASH AND SQUASH 57 IN THE COUNTY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
81 Moorend Crescent
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL53 0EW
- Phone:
- 07970352511
- Email:
- Jameshession357@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window