Accounts and annual returns AL MADINAH LIMITED

Charity Number: 1181722
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 14 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 14 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 13 April 2024 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 13 April 2024 107 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 14 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 17 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 30 December 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 30 December 2020 1 days late Download Open in new window