AL MADINAH LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity is aiming to arranging family activities among members and these activities includes five time prayer in congregation, children outdoor entertainment, homework club, party meals, daily get-together for elderly people etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 24 January 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAJAB ALEE | Chair | 28 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALHASSAN ABUBAKARI | Trustee | 28 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
MD MASUD AHMED CHOWDHURY | Trustee | 28 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.63k | £24.66k | £18.41k | £224.56k | £31.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.55k | £7.91k | £3.66k | £275.28k | £31.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.10k | £13.55k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 13 April 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 13 April 2024 | 107 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 30 December 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 30 December 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 FEB 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH:- • ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING AN ISLAMIC CULTURAL CENTRE FOR THE MUSLIM POPULATION OF NORWICH; • PROMOTING RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY BETWEEN MUSLIMS AND NON-MUSLIMS IN ORDER TO FOSTER MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND TOLERANCE LEADING TO SOCIAL COHESION AND SOCIAL CAPITAL AND CONTRIBUTING TOWARDS A BETTER SOCIETY; AND • ADVANCING AWARENESS OF ISLAMIC VALUES AMONGST THE PEOPLE OF NORWICH THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES AND PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND TO MAKE AVAILABLE RELIGIOUS BOOKS, TRACTS, FILMS AND OTHER INFORMATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.”
Contact information
- Address:
-
Al-Madinah Community Centre
58 Sandy Lane
NORWICH
NR1 2NR
- Phone:
- 07951618823
- Email:
- aleerajab6@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window