WORD GENERATION MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We advance the Christian faith for the benefit of the public through activities such as the holding of prayer meetings, lectures, evangelism, and conventions, producing and/or distributing literature on the Christian Faith and also providing a place of worship, in Welwyn-Hatfield borough and parts of the United Kingdom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- WGMI (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.66k | £2.19k | £100 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.74k | £2.90k | £100 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 November 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 May 2022 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 May 2022 | 197 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF WORD GENERATION MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL IS, TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN WELWYN-HATFIELD BOROUGH AND PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, EVANGELISM, AND CONVENTIONS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window