FORTON VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management and upkeep of village hall and recreation ground (including a pavillion which is located on the recreation ground) Note: This was previously split between two seperate charities (Hall and Recreation Ground) which officially merged in January 2011 to form a single charitie and committee.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 11 August 1982: Standard registration
- 04 September 1991: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 10 September 1997: Standard registration
- FORTON PLAYING FIELD (Working name)
- FORTON RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine McDonald | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenna Elizabeth Metcalfe | Trustee | 31 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alice Jesmont | Trustee | 22 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOY OLIVER | Trustee | 15 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.15k | £41.87k | £38.17k | £10.84k | £5.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.63k | £11.37k | £14.01k | £18.17k | £18.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £40.67k | £23.73k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 February 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 14 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, INCLUDING THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FORTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Home Farm
Stony Lane
Clifton Hill
Forton
PRESTON
Lancashi
- Phone:
- 01524791313
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window