MARISTOW CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain its land and property, to provide donations and funding to other charitable organisations and such charitable purposes as the Trustees determine
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORD MASSEY JOHN HENRY Roborough | Chair | 12 November 2018 |
|
|||||
LADY SARAH ANNE PIPON ROBOROUGH | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
HARRY MARCUS GEORGE LOPES | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD SIMPSON | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £128.69k | £159.34k | £178.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £83.05k | £97.83k | £202.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 February 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 February 2023 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
(A) THE CONSERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT, UPKEEP, BEAUTIFICATION AND PRESERVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE NATION OF THE BUILDING KNOWN AS ST MARTIN'S CHAPEL, MARISTOW, ROBOROUGH, PLYMOUTH PL6 7BZ AND ADJOINING OR SURROUNDING LANDS, AND SUCH OTHER LANDS AND TENEMENTS (INCLUDING BUILDINGS) OF ARCHITECTURAL OR HISTORIC INTEREST AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE VESTED IN THE CHARITY AND, AS REGARDS LANDS, FOR THE PRESERVATION (AS FAR AS PRACTICABLE) OF THEIR NATURAL ASPECT, FEATURES AND ANIMAL AND PLANT LIFE. (B) SO FAR AS REASONABLE PRACTICABLE FROM TIME TO TIME THE PROCUREMENT OR ENABLEMENT OF THE CONDUCT OF CHRISTIAN SERVICES AT THE SAID ST MARTIN'S CHAPEL. (C) THE PRESERVATION OF FURNITURE, PICTURES AND CHATTELS OF ANY DESCRIPTION HAVING NATIONAL AND HISTORIC OR ARTISTIC INTEREST SITAUTE AT OR CONTAINED WITHIN SUCH LANDS, TENEMENTS AND BUILDINGS OR OTHERWISE VESTED IN THE CHARITY. (D) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Maristow Estate Office
Roborough
PLYMOUTH
PL6 7BN
- Phone:
- 01752695945
- Email:
- accounts@maristow.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window