GLOBAL COOLING ENVIRONMENTAL SUSTAINABILITY LTD

Charity number: 1180036
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Global Cooling is an environmental sustainability charity. Our primary aim is to plant and protect trees around the world to help retain all the benefits trees bring along with slowing and reversing global warming. Our secondary aim is to then show how humans and all other forms of life can co-exist successfully without having to destroy the natural beauty and life of our planet.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 14 August 2019

Total income: £11,094
Total expenditure: £2,546

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 September 2018: Standard registration
  • 09 February 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • GLOBAL COOLING ENVIRONMENTAL SUSTAINABILITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 14/08/2019
Total gross income £11.09k
Total expenditure £2.55k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 August 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 14 August 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 14 August 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 14 August 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 14 August 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 14 August 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 14 August 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 14 August 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 14 August 2019 21 June 2020 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 August 2019 Not Required