LINCOLN CHRIST'S HOSPITAL SCHOOL
Charity number: 512948
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 16 August 1982: Standard registration
- 23 February 1993: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INSTRUMENT OF GOVERNMENT DATED 9TH AUGUST, 1974 AND ARTICLES OF GOVERNMENT DATED 25TH MARCH, 1975.
Charitable objects
A DAY SCHOOL FOR BOYS AND GIRLS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 19 AUGUST 1980
Charitable objects
INCOME SHALL BE APPLY IN ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND YOUNG MEN WHO ARE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO HAVE BEEN PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL OR AT THE FORMER LINCOLN SCHOOL, LINCOLN, WHO IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES ARE IN NEED OF FINACIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 16 August 1982 : Standard registration
- 23 February 1993 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.