THE ERROL MCKELLAR FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Errol McKellar Foundation's aim is to pursue the advancement of health and the saving of lives by creating greater awareness of the dangers and issues of prostate cancer among men in England and Wales and the promotion of the need for regular health and prostate cancer PSA tests, in particular but not exclusively for men over the age of 45. 1 in 8 men in the UK will develop prostate cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 January 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW JOHN ROBERTS | Chair | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Leon FREDERICK | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR FRANCIS IKECHUKWU CHINEGWUNDOH MBE | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
HERMAN MILTON KELSEY DYER | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.64k | £4.78k | £27.33k | £19.17k | £23.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.59k | £3.22k | £13.77k | £15.28k | £29.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 31 July 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 31 July 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES BY CREATING GREATER AWARENESS OF THE DANGERS AND ISSUES OF PROSTATE CANCER AMONG MEN IN ENGLAND AND WALES AND THE PROMOTION OF THE NEED FOR REGULAR HEALTH AND PROSTATE CANCER PSA TESTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR MEN OVER THE AGE OF 45. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS PURPOSE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE POWER TO: A) ARRANGE AND GIVE EDUCATIONAL TALKS BY MEN WHO HAVE SURVIVED PROSTATE CANCER; B) ENCOURAGE MEN TO “MOT YOURSELF’ BY BEING MORE AWARE OF THEIR WIDER HEALTH ISSUES; C) PROACTIVELY ARRANGE TO SPEAK WITH MEN IN DISADVANTAGED OR HARD TO REACH GROUPS OR COMMUNITIES, WORKING CLOSELY WITH COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS THAT MAY INCLUDE MULTI-FAITH GROUPS AND CHURCHES, PRISONS, SPORTS CLUBS AND HOMELESS ORGANISATIONS; D) REACH OUT TO MEN WHO MAY OTHERWISE NOT KNOW ABOUT THE DANGERS OF PROSTATE CANCER; AND E) RAISE AWARENESS OF THE WORK OF THE FOUNDATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIELD VIEW
CUTLERS GREEN
THAXTED
DUNMOW
CM6 2PZ
- Phone:
- 07850317995
- Email:
- temf2018@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window