THE HEERA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Heera Foundation's Objectives are: The preservation and protection of good health for the public benefiting the UK by: -Providing access to support, advice and education by organising workshops and events -Working to support the translation of key mental health materials from existing services to be accessible for all
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAVANDEEP JOHAL | Chair | 31 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simran Kaur Batth | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarbjit Singh Bisla | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jagroop Chahal | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
BALBIR KANDOLA | Trustee | 31 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.68k | £2.34k | £17.87k | £28.58k | £4.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.26k | £3.65k | £14.14k | £25.97k | £6.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £15.00k | £3.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 June 2024 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2023
(These accounts |
06 June 2024 | 122 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UK BY: A) PROVIDING ACCESS TO SUPPORT, ADVICE, AND EDUCATION INCLUDING BY ORGANISING PUBLIC WORKSHOPS AND EVENTS; B) WORKING TO SUPPORT THE TRANSLATION OF KEY MENTAL HEALTH MATERIALS FROM EXISTING SERVICES TO BE ACCESSIBLE FOR ALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 HALL DRIVE
BURTON-ON-THE-WOLDS
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE12 5AD
- Phone:
- 0300 102 1524
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window