UPTON YOUTH BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to instruct young people between the ages of 8 and 25years to play an instrument, read music and the discipline of marching and displays. Also to compete in competitions across the country.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2015
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 14 September 1982: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANN DALE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lesley Anne Probert | Trustee | 06 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
RUTH PROBERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN LANE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHELLE LOUISE ODELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SALLY ANN DUDLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.19k | £4.18k | £3.26k | £3.29k | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.55k | £4.58k | £4.12k | £4.12k | £3.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 297 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 297 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 663 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 663 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1028 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1028 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1393 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1393 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1758 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1758 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 FEBRUARY 1982 AS AMENDED 21 JANUARY 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WITHIN THE AGES OF 8 AND 25, RESIDENT IN UPTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THEREOF BY TRAINING THEM IN THE PLAYING OF MARCHING BANK INSTRUMENTS AND BY MEANS OF CONCERTS AND EXHIBITIONS AT WHICH SUCH CHILDREN MAY PERFORM AS A BAND TO ADVANCE THE AESTHETIC EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
UPTON UPON SEVERN
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 Howsell Road
Malvern
WR14 1TH
- Phone:
- 01684893038
- Email:
- sallydudley@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window