NEW NATION DESTINY CENTRE (NNDC)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian religion in the UK and other parts of the world for the benefit of the public through the provision of a place of worship, holding of prayer meetings, lectures and training courses, pastoral care and outreach work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Malaysia
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 08 July 2019: CIO registration
- NEW NATION DESTINY CENTRE (NNDC) CIO (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Andrew Da Costa | Chair | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Cargill | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nadine Henningham | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Idera Diana Smith | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Keniesha Nadine Miller | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.14k | £44.98k | £99.42k | £51.85k | £53.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.49k | £33.85k | £61.97k | £59.64k | £55.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE UK AND OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A PLACE OF WORSHIP, HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES AND TRAINING COURSES, PASTORAL CARE AND OUTREACH WORK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holloway Hall
Court Passage
Dudley
West Midlands
DY1 1EX
- Phone:
- 01384671170
- Email:
- nndcministries@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window