JAMES MARSHALL FOUNDATION CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance in life young people living in Harpenden, Wheathampstead, Redbourn, Kimpton, Flamstead and Markyate who are under the age of 25 and in financial hardship by the provision of grants to assist with their education and career development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 05 December 2018: CIO registration
- 15 January 2020: Funds received from 312127 JAMES MARSHALL FOUNDATION
- JAMES MARSHALL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Andrews | Chair | 08 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Nigel Richard Herbert Wallis | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam James Shapton | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Mary Rickard | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Elizabeth Finnemore | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Dyson | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Prynn | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Andrew John Large | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Marcus Robert Finch | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £362.34k | £376.94k | £390.62k | £411.42k | £436.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £225.56k | £253.56k | £259.96k | £432.27k | £424.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 05 DEC 2018 AMENDED ON 24 JUL 2020 as amended on 19 Aug 2021 as amended on 25 Nov 2021 as amended on 27 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
To advance in life young people living in Harpenden, Wheathampstead, Redbourn, Markyate, Flamstead, Kimpton and East Hyde, who are under the age of 25 and in financial hardship by the provision of grants to assist with their education and career development with priority given to those aged 16 and over. In exceptional circumstances if necessary, priority will be given to those applicants living in Harpenden and Wheathampstead. '
Area of benefit
HARPENDEN, WHEATHAMPSTEAD, REDBOURN, MARKYATE, FLAMSTEAD, KIMPTON AND EAST HYDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 6
17 LEYTON ROAD
HARPENDEN
AL5 2HY
- Phone:
- 01582760735
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window