PROVIDE DEVON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide Devon uses surplus food (supplemented by purchased fresh produce) donated by businesses and homes by redirecting it to those in financial need, without judgement or discrimination. Support to disadvantaged or marginalised individuals and families is given, meeting the basic requirements of clients in a one off crisis food hamper.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Devon
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 12 December 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARC ANTHONY NASH | Chair | 22 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Simpkins | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hayter | Trustee | 17 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR GRAHAM SPENCER STIRLING | Trustee | 21 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jean Potter | Trustee | 20 October 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.69k | £100.49k | £43.43k | £59.16k | £64.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.92k | £70.17k | £57.73k | £59.98k | £77.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.00k | N/A | £6.90k | £19.00k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THIS CIO IS THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN DEVON THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FOOD HAMPERS TO PEOPLE WHO ARE IN FINANCIAL NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 12 Walkham Business Park
Burrington Way
Plymouth
Devon
PL5 3AW
- Phone:
- 07928670704
- Email:
- info@providedevon.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window