SING INSIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sing Inside deliver group singing workshops in prisons across England and Wales, engaging volunteers from local community organisations and universities to form a choir alongside prison residents and staff. We work to build self-confidence and self-worth through shared musical and vocal skills, breaking down stereotypical views about prisons and building strong communities through group singing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,992 from 1 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
130 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 March 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Robert Smyth | Chair | 03 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
William Evans | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Lucy Elizabeth Cullen | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sir Nigel David Poole | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Schranz | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Giverny McAndry | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aine Elizabeth Jackson | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.77k | £11.67k | £10.19k | £32.50k | £48.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.79k | £6.24k | £5.67k | £17.99k | £39.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.99k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF MUSIC BY: - CONDUCTING CHORAL WORKSHOPS IN UK PRISONS AND HOLDING FACILITIES AND PROMOTING MUSIC AND THE PERFORMING ARTS FOR INMATES AND ALL WHO WORK OR LIVE WITHIN A PRISON SETTING USING VOLUNTEERS DRAWN FROM UK UNIVERSITIES AND LOCAL CHOIRS; - TRAINING AND DEVELOPING THE MUSICIANSHIP AND EDUCATIONAL LEADERSHIP SKILLS OF VOLUNTEERS DRAWN FROM UK UNIVERSITIES AND LOCAL CHOIRS TO SUPPORT WORKSHOP DELIVERY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
95 Clarence Crescent
Clapham
London
SW4 8LE
- Phone:
- 07495734122
- Email:
- info@singinside.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window