Lighthouse Safe Harbour

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lighthouse Safe Harbour is designed specifically, but not exclusively, for children with Special Educational Needs (such as Autism, ADHD, Sensory Processing needs and Attachment needs), who also present with behaviour that challenges. Activities include: worship, teaching, sports, craft, plus sessions to explore the day's theme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 21 November 2018: CIO registration
- LIGHTHOUSE BOURNE END (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison McClements | Chair | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Rayner | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Mill | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Rachel Chapman | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tabitha Caroe | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Lindley | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.40k | £242 | £76 | £4.37k | £3.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.43k | £1.74k | £100 | £2.69k | £2.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 31 July 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 31 July 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Nov 2018 as amended on 17 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH PRIMARILY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF AN ANNUAL HOLIDAY WEEK FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BOURNE END, BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, WITH ACTIVITIES IN A COMBINATION OF PERFORMING ARTS, TEACHING, MUSIC, AND HANDICRAFTS DELIVERED IN WAYS WHICH ADVANCE UNDERSTANDING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND ITS VALUES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Foresters
Water End
Stokenchurch
HIGH WYCOMBE
Buckinghamshire
HP14 3XQ
- Phone:
- 07415 739611
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window