Financial history WIGAN U3A

Charity number: 1181457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.27k £1.62k £12.22k £18.18k £21.38k
Total expenditure £10.36k £1.76k £11.97k £16.27k £18.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A