DISASTER ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the safety of the public against disasters and to enlist and provide support, succour, guidance and assistance generally to those including dependants and families, who have been or may be affected by such disasters or may be so affected in the future.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 October 2018: CIO registration
- 04 March 2020: Funds received from 1005728 DISASTER ACTION
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SOPHIE TARASSENKO | Chair | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Edie Macgill Fassnidge | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
MOYA MILLICENT WOOD-HEATH | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAIN JAMES DOMINIC PHILPOTT | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.53k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.12k | £378 | £878 | £878 | £188 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 02 September 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 02 September 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 09 August 2024 | 344 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 09 August 2024 | 344 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 25 November 2022 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 04 September 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 04 September 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
(1)TO PROMOTE THE SAFETY OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY OR OF ANY SECTION OF THE PUBLIC AND OR MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC, AGAINST DISASTERS INVOLVING MULTIPLE DEATHS OR INJURY OR EXTENSIVE DESTRUCTION OF BUILDINGS OR PROPERTY, WHERE SUCH DISASTERS OCCUR IN PUBLIC PLACES AND WHETHER BY LAND, WATER OR AIR, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE ABOVE PURPOSES TO DEVISE, RESEARCH, CARRY OUT, MAKE KNOWN, DISSEMINATE, ADVOCATE, EXPLAIN AND ADVANCE PRINCIPLES AND METHODS FOR SECURING OR FURTHERING THE PREVENTION OF AND PROTECTION AGAINST ACCIDENTS OF ALL KINDS LIKELY TO GIVE RISE TO SUCH DISASTERS. (2)TO ENLIST AND PROVIDE SUPPORT, SUCCOUR, GUIDANCE AND ASSISTANCE GENERALLY TO THOSE INCLUDING DEPENDANTS AND FAMILIES, WHO HAVE BEEN OR MAY BE AFFECTED BY SUCH DISASTERS OR MAY BE SO AFFECTED IN THE FUTURE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 LEIGHTON GARDENS
LONDON
NW10 3PT
- Phone:
- 02476505262
- Email:
- admin@disasteraction.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window