FRIENDS OF THE GUILDHALL, NEWCASTLE UNDER LYME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a reception service for the users of the Guildhall and to serve as an information and advice service for members of the public. To promote use of the reception area by community groups including the Friends of the Guildhall. To promote the history of the building.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £400 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 27 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilary Jones | Chair | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Julie Cooper | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Michael John Hill | Trustee | 12 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Marie-Claire Marcelle Billard | Trustee | 12 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Sandra Glenys Key | Trustee | 12 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Jeremy Lefroy | Trustee | 13 November 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Alec Wright | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||
David Cedric Noble | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Keith Greatbatch | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Ruth Wright | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.31k | £3.15k | £1.73k | £8.68k | £16.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.87k | £2.44k | £684 | £6.59k | £15.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £400 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Sep 2019 as amended on 22 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PROMOTE THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT TO VOLUNTARY, COMMUNITY AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISE ORGANISATIONS AND PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREAS OF STAFFORDSHIRE AND STOKE ON TRENT AND THEIR ENVIRONS SO AS TO ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE OR CONTRIBUTE TO ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE. THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS. CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATION WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES WHICH ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Guildhall
High Street
NEWCASTLE
ST5 1PW
- Phone:
- 01782632895
- Email:
- fotguildhall@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window