HIGHGATE COMMUNITY SUPPORT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Highgate Community Support Limited promotes health, good nourishment, and healthy recreational services to people in Highgate, Birmingham who (i) are hungry and/or in need of nourishment and exercise (ii) children and young people (iii) those in the community who are lonely or not able to fully look after themselves. All events and services are open to anyone and are free of charge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 22 October 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tinamarie Pena-Smith | Chair | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Mohammed Shafique | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
Mark Andrew Dalton | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
AMANDA MARY CADMAN | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.92k | £39.12k | £32.21k | £23.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.64k | £22.24k | £33.16k | £9.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 07 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 NOV 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN HIGHGATE, BIRMINGHAM: A)THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY PROVIDING SUCH SERVICES AND FACILITIES AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE AND WHICH ARE DIRECTED TO PROMOTING HEALTH, GOOD NOURISHMENT AND HEALTHY RECREATION FOR PEOPLE WHO COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THEM; B)THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
STANHOPE HALL
KETLEY CROFT
HIGHGATE
BIRMINGHAM
B12 0XG
- Phone:
- 07535741781
- Email:
- headoffice_hcsl@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window