EVERMORE DOG RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote humane behaviour towards dogs in Romania in particular, but not exclusively, by: Supporting rescuers that provide appropriate care, protection and treatment for dogs which are in need of care by reason of sickness or maltreatment Rehoming dogs who are in need of rehoming Educating the public in matters pertaining to dog welfare in general and the need for Spay & Neuter in particular
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Romania
Governance
- 18 March 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARILYN ANGELL | Chair | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Horseman | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Sandoe | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rhian O'Brien | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE OLIVER | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/08/2020 | 04/08/2021 | 04/08/2022 | 04/08/2023 | 04/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £233.24k | £230.52k | £206.93k | £169.28k | £182.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £229.26k | £212.50k | £191.65k | £168.00k | £168.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 August 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 August 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 August 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 August 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 August 2022 | 12 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 August 2022 | 12 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 August 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 August 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 August 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 August 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS DOGS IN ROMANIA IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: • SUPPORTING SHELTERS THAT PROVIDE APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR DOGS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE, • REHOMING DOGS WHO ARE IN NEED OF REHOMING AND • EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO DOG WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG DOGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Cleevelands Drive
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL50 4QF
- Phone:
- 07715504641
- Email:
- evermoredogrescue@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window