YOURCHURCH GLOBAL MOVEMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To Act As An Umbrella Or Resource Body over Ministries & Companies. The relief of poverty/financial hardship of people living locally or internationally, by providing grants/Jobs & supported accommodation to those most in need. To educate the public about the Christian religion through live/online lectures, and distributing literature & content to restore the fundamental values.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- Leeds City
- Nottinghamshire
- Southend-on-sea
- Botswana
- South Africa
- Uganda
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 15 February 2019: Standard registration
- Your Church International Global Movement t/a The Hub (Working name)
- YOUR CHURCH INTERNATIONAL GLOBAL MOVEMENT (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eunice Diza | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice H Zomba | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joy Annie Itai Nyadete | Trustee | 27 August 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/01/2020 | 04/01/2021 | 04/01/2022 | 04/01/2023 | 04/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.26k | £9.83k | £10.05k | £15.37k | £29.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.40k | £10.33k | £6.02k | £12.57k | £26.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 January 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 January 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 January 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 January 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 January 2021 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 January 2020 | 23 December 2020 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 FEB 2016 AS AMENDED ON 12 DEC 2018 as amended on 21 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE 1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PRODUCING AND DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIAN RELIGION TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY/FINANCIAL HARDSHIP EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY OF PEOPLE LIVING LOCALLY OR INTERNATIONALLY BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Trent Bridge Road
RETFORD
Nottinghamshire
DN22 7SR
- Phone:
- 01777712717
- Email:
- hello@ycglobalmovement.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window