TREATSMA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We do everything possible to ensure that all people with SMA have access to effective treatments, health care and social support. We raise awareness of the disease, offer support to those affected and their near and dear ones, promote and support scientific research into causes and treatments, and provide necessary equipment and living aids.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 March 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Thornton | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
LUCY FROST | Trustee | 08 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr GENNADIY ILYASHENKO | Trustee | 08 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.83k | £10.85k | £17.65k | £18.36k | £871 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.89k | £1.92k | £2.29k | £188 | £12.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 November 2024 | 288 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 19 November 2024 | 288 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 February 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 20 February 2023 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 08 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1209 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF PERSONS WITH SPINAL MUSCULAR ATROPHY, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) ADVANCING KNOWLEDGE IN ALL ASPECTS OF SPINAL MUSCULAR ATROPHY; (B) IMPROVING ACCESS TO APPROPRIATE HEALTHCARE, INCLUDING DIAGNOSTICS, TREATMENTS, AND ASSISTIVE TECHNOLOGIES; AND (C) PROMOTING SOCIAL INCLUSION OF PEOPLE WITH SPINAL MUSCULAR ATROPHY, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS
Contact information
- Address:
-
TreatSMA
85 Great Portland St
First Floor
London
W1W 7LT
- Phone:
- 03008000202
- Email:
- treatsma@treatsma.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window