WAKEFIELD FOOTBALL CENTRE COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation in particular by the provision of facilities for playing football
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 23 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lee Halls | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
John O'leary | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Burke | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/10/2020 | 30/10/2021 | 30/10/2022 | 30/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2021 | 26 January 2023 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2021 | 26 January 2023 | 149 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2020 | 26 January 2023 | 514 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2020 | 26 January 2023 | 514 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
97 Valley Drive
Wrenthorpe
WAKEFIELD
WF2 0TL
- Phone:
- 01924609198
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window