BAYSWATER FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bayswater Foundation mission is to educate and inspire the next generation. Our objective is to advance the education of people typically aged under 25 years old through English language classes and other skill programmes. We gift grants to other charities and organisations to provide this tuition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Argentina
- Brazil
- China
- Colombia
- Italy
- Japan
- Jordan
- Switzerland
- Vietnam
Governance
- 12 December 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES ALEXANDER HERBERTSON | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Stephan Roussounis | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.31k | £1.11k | £10.04k | £20.69k | £28.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.49k | £1.83k | £4.91k | £24.11k | £27.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2024 | 263 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2024 | 263 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN THE STUDY OF THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE AND OTHER SUBJECTS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BY BUT NOT LIMITED TO: • PROVIDING GRANT FUNDING TO OVERSEAS SCHOOLS FOR THE PROVISION OF ENGLISH LANGUAGE LESSONS; • PROVIDING TRAINING TO TEACHERS AND/OR THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL AND DIGITAL EDUCATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
BAYSWATER FOUNDATION
167 QUEENSWAY
LONDON
W2 4SB
- Phone:
- 02072217259
- Email:
- james@bayswater.ac
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window