Financial history NESTON NOMADS FOOTBALL CLUB LTD

Charity number: 1180802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £53.50k £59.96k £114.24k £142.22k £130.46k
Total expenditure £51.83k £34.54k £100.30k £130.54k £168.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A