NESTON NOMADS FOOTBALL CLUB LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation and particularly by the provision of facilities for the coaching and playing of football for all ages, sexes and abilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 November 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Moss | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Donald Munnerley | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ann Garland | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carl William Bishop | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
KEITH PENNY | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.50k | £59.96k | £114.24k | £142.22k | £130.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.83k | £34.54k | £100.30k | £130.54k | £168.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 August 2024 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 20 August 2024 | 112 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 MAR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 NOV 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND PLAYING OF FOOTBALL FOR ALL AGES, SEXES AND ABILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NETHERLEIGH
MILL LANE
WILLASTON
NESTON
CH64 1RW
- Phone:
- 01516493900
- Email:
- kpenny@hwca.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window