Trustees HOLCOMBE ROGUS VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1182063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Polly Rebecca Page Trustee 21 December 2023
None on record
Dr Jago Rupert Marchant Snook Trustee 15 April 2023
None on record
Ann Hilary Garnham Trustee 14 September 2022
None on record
Linda Diane Wyeth Trustee 23 May 2022
None on record
Jeremy Hugh Hillman Trustee 09 January 2021
None on record
Richard Grant Wiltshire Trustee 19 October 2019
None on record
Sarah Lindsay Gabriel Trustee 16 February 2019
None on record