DIGNITY AND WORTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dignity and Worth works to raise awareness around and promote understanding about issues relating to LGBT inclusion among Christians in Britain, especially Methodists and to promote equality and diversity in Methodist Churches.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 July 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alister Walker McClure | Chair | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Pearl Ann Luxon | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev AMANDA GRACE BRIGGS | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Benjamin Anthony McMahon-Riley | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev DELYTH ANGHARAD LIDDELL | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Mark Rowland | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Samuel Eric McBratney | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.48k | £4.45k | £4.79k | £4.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.94k | £1.45k | £3.95k | £1.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 February 2025 | 239 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 February 2025 | 239 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT REGARDING THE LGBT+ COMMUNITY, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, AMONG METHODISTS, BY: A) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; B) PROVIDING ACTIVITIES AND INFORMATION TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS AND CULTIVATE A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; C) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION AGAINST LGBT+ PEOPLE;
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE MANSE
MURCOTT ROAD EAST
WHITNASH
LEAMINGTON SPA
CV31 2JJ
- Phone:
- 01926730358
- Email:
- info@dignityandworth.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window