Freedom Angels Romania

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the suffering of animals in need of care and attention and, in particular, to provide and maintain a rescue and rehoming service for the reception, care and treatment of stray dogs and cats from Romania who by reason of abandonment, neglect or mistreatment are in need of such care and attention.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Romania
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 April 2019: CIO registration
- FAAR (Previous name)
- FREEDOM ANGELS ANIMAL RESCUE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carole Ann Harris | Chair | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Monica Bennett | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Vaux | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Wright | Trustee | 11 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
KATRINA WRIGHT | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £274.22k | £274.22k | £152.87k | £114.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £248.85k | £248.85k | £167.01k | £118.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Apr 2019 as amended on 04 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A RESCUE AND REHOMING SERVICE FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF STRAY DOGS IN ROMANIA AND CYPRUS WHO BY REASON OF ABANDONMENT, NEGLECT OR MISTREATMENT ARE IN NEED OF SUCH CARE AND ATTENTION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Middlefield Farm
New Yatt Road
WITNEY
Oxfordshire
OX29 6TA
- Phone:
- 07900264892
- Email:
- adopt@fardogs.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window