Financial history WAKEFIELD LITTLE THEATRE

Charity number: 512988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.54k £15.20k £7.81k £34.94k £39.61k
Total expenditure £9.52k £6.31k £6.18k £37.15k £35.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A