WAKEFIELD LITTLE THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amateur Dramatics
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Barnsley
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 09 September 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN GRACE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sue Rowley | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Trigg | Trustee | 27 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA PRIEST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.54k | £15.20k | £7.81k | £34.94k | £39.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.52k | £6.31k | £6.18k | £37.15k | £35.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 111 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
AMENDED CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 14 APRIL 1982
Charitable objects
TO STIMULATE AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE STUDY OF DRAMATIC ART AND FOR THIS PURPOSE TO PROMOTE COURSES AND STUDY-CLASSES. TO PROMOTE THE STUDY AND PERFORMANCE OF PLAYS AND OTHER DRAMATIC WORKS WHETHER BY WAY OF PRODUCTIONS, PUBLIC OR PRIVATE PERFORMANCES, PLAY-READINGS, DRAMATIC FESTIVALS IN WAKEFIELD, OR AS OTHERWISE DECIDED FROM TIME TO TIME. TO PROVIDE OR FURTHER OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF A CIVIC THEATRE IN THE CITY OF WAKEFIELD.
Area of benefit
WAKEFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Kingsmead
OSSETT
West Yorkshire
WF5 8RX
- Phone:
- 07770558431
- Email:
- malcolm@malcolmtrigg.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window