THE FRANKIE FOUNDATION FOR CHILDREN

Charity Number: 1180488
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity will offer, every year, a show to thousands of sick, disabled or disadvantaged children in London with gifts and goodies for each child. The Charity will also explore ways to improve the lives of these children.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £1,848
Total expenditure: £28,113

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 October 2018: CIO registration
  • 20 May 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 20 May 2024: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £256.65k £2.14k £236 £1.21k £1.85k
Total expenditure £42.45k £53.46k £53.72k £35.18k £28.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 07 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 07 December 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2022 12 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 12 April 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2021 18 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 18 March 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2020 29 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 29 March 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2019 20 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 20 May 2020 On Time