BRACKLEY & DISTRICT U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We meet monthly and have a speaker and refreshments. At present we have 25 groups up and running varying from Traditional Dancing - Singing - Family History - Sunday outings and lunch this just a few. We have an open morning when all our activities are on display and this is open to members and non members to come in and see what we are all about also a Christmas social.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 04 October 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERRY FRANK PIGOTT | Chair | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Shepherd | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Williams | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Blunden | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gill Zachar | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Moore | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|||||
IAN NIXON | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.77k | £4.08k | £1.42k | £9.36k | £11.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.41k | £3.55k | £3.62k | £7.45k | £9.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MAY 2018 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 BLENCOWE DRIVE
BRACKLEY
NN13 6HH
- Phone:
- 07763364078
- Email:
- janetblunden@icloud.com
- Website:
-
Brackley & District U3A
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window