THE PARENTING CIRCLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Parenting Circle engages school parents to improve their children's school-readiness. Our parenting discussion groups extend parenting classes. Led by the same trained group leader who delivered the parenting class the discussion groups last for as long as parents want. The groups become sustainable when the trained group leader identifies and trains a participating parent to lead the group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £8,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Campbell | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Dickinson | Trustee | 15 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amicia Oldfield | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Cristina Odone M.A. Oxon | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
VIRGINIA MARY FRASER | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.16k | £21.09k | £7.88k | £15.22k | £8.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £4.24k | £3.51k | £8.40k | £8.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 December 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 December 2021 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 November 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE FOUNDATION ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARENTING AND CHILD-REARING SKILLS BY ANY MEANS, INCLUDING: (1) BY THE PROVISION, OR THE SUPPORT OF PROVIDERS, OF PARENT SUPPORT GROUPS, PARENTING EDUCATION AND TRAINING COURSES AND OTHER FORMAL AND INFORMAL PARENT GROUPS; (2) BY THE PROVISION OF APPROPRIATE EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING MATERIALS; AND (3) BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT, SUPPORT AND TRAINING OF VOLUNTEER AND PROFESSIONAL COURSE LEADERS AND PARENT MENTORS, IN EACH CASE, FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: (A) ENABLING CHILDREN TO ENJOY HAPPY AND FULFILLING CHILDHOODS AND PREPARING THEM FOR ADULTHOOD; (B) ENABLING PARENTS TO ENJOY FULFILLING AND REWARDING RELATIONSHIPS WITH THEIR CHILDREN; (C) STRENGTHENING THE BONDS BETWEEN CHILDREN AND THEIR PARENTS; (D) PROMOTING STRONG, STABLE FAMILY RELATIONSHIPS; AND (E) PROMOTING THE MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF PARENTS AND CHILDREN, AND FOR THESE PURPOSES, "PARENT" INCLUDES ALL THOSE WHO ENGAGE IN PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIPS WITH CHILDREN, WHETHER OR NOT AS THEIR NATURAL OR BIOLOGICAL PARENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 TETCOTT ROAD
LONDON
SW10 0SB
- Phone:
- 07884446357
- Email:
- cristinaodone@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window