ECO SOUL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. The charity will offer an educational experience of sustainable living to visitors, akin to a 24-hour lived exhibition on urban environmentally sustainable living. 2. The charity will offer educational talks and multi-day workshops to visitors and the local community. 3. The charity will donate or reinvest surplus to further its charitable objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 02 January 2020: Standard registration
- ECO SOUL HOSTEL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marcos Troia Machado Silva | Chair | 20 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Irina Bolychevsky | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Florence Fenny Scialom | Trustee | 20 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.80k | £210 | £215 | £2.73k | £1.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.13k | £2.39k | £2.95k | £2.73k | £1.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 FEB 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 DEC 2019
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECTS OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT, SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT, GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND CIVIC RESPONSIBILITY. 2. THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES. 3. THE PROMOTION OF VOLUNTEERING. 4. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION, EDUCATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF ALL WHO USE SUCH FACILITIES. IN THESE OBJECTS “SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT” MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 CROMWELL ROAD
LONDON
SW9 7BJ
- Phone:
- 02080588857
- Email:
- welcome@ecosoullondon.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window