CARMARTHEN LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1180192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Income is derived from, primarily, an annual Charity dinner as well as an Easter Egg raffle and also 'Santa' at Christmas. Funds are utilised in the provision of grants to deserving causes within the Carmarthen area, district, and Lions Multiple District Area. There is an acknowledgement of the Club's international obligations with a contribution to LCIF the Lions Clubs International Foundation.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £277
Total expenditure: £227

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Carmarthenshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 October 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROGER CHIDZOY LEWIS Chair 20 June 2018
None on record
MICHAEL WYNN THOMAS Trustee 20 June 2018
None on record
ALUN HOWARD EVANS Trustee 20 June 2018
None on record
BARRIE GRIFFITH MARTIN Trustee 20 June 2018
None on record
DAVID JOEL MORGAN Trustee 20 June 2018
None on record
ROBERT DUDLEY THOMAS Trustee 20 June 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.76k £1.11k £525 £356 £277
Total expenditure £2.70k £1.80k £961 £935 £227
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 14 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 14 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 11 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 11 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 21 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 21 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 05 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 05 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 13 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 14 June 2021 14 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Y DDOL
LLANSAWEL
LLANDEILO
SA19 7HZ
Phone:
01558685522