POLYMNIA

Charity number: 1181422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Polymnia is a chamber choir of ~23 members who rehearse and perform concerts of choral music, of a wide range of genres from early music to the 21st century, to a high standard for the benefit of audiences mainly in and around Milton Keynes. Much of the music is performed a cappella but occasionally professional musicians are engaged to accompany the choir.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £18,031
Total expenditure: £17,610

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 January 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul North Chair 04 January 2019
None on record
Sophia Mary Farrell-Reed Trustee 15 March 2024
None on record
John Peregrine Williams Trustee 25 October 2021
None on record
Katherine Mary Atalay Trustee 25 October 2021
None on record
BRIAN JOSEPH COULSTOCK Trustee 04 January 2019
LEIGHTON BUZZARD MUSIC
Received: On time
Dr Georgina Mary Johnson Trustee 04 January 2019
None on record
Christine Crispus Jones Trustee 04 January 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £19.83k £2.74k £2.74k £6.32k £18.03k
Total expenditure £12.91k £4.81k £4.81k £7.53k £17.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 24 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 02 March 2024 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 02 March 2024 93 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 30 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 30 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 29 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 29 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 31 March 2021 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 31 March 2021 121 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
43 MONELLAN CRESCENT
CALDECOTTE
MILTON KEYNES
MK7 8NA
Phone:
07764 502620