BENGALI ASSOCIATION OF MERSEYSIDE AND NORTH OF ENGLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Social,Cultural,Religious and charity activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Knowsley
Governance
- 02 December 1982: Standard registration
- LIVERPOOL PUJA COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Soumyen Bandyopadhay | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prasenjit Prabhat Kumar Thakur | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Niladri Ghosal | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
DR BIPLAB DAS BIPLAB | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
SANDIP CHATTERJEE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.22k | £9.20k | £8.67k | £25.42k | £35.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.41k | £5.41k | £6.61k | £27.57k | £29.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 OCTOBER 1982
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE BENGALI COMMUNITY AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH INHABITANTS. B) TO PROMOTE THE PERFORMANCE OF RELIGIOUS CELEBRATIONS INDIGENOUS TO THE BENGALIS OF HINDU ORIGIN AND IN PARTICULAR THE CELEBRATION OF DURGAPUJA. C) TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF THE BENGALIS LANGUAGE AND LITERATURE AND HELP THOSE WHO WISH TO LEARN ENGLISH.
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 MILTON DRIVE
ORMSKIRK
L39 4QU
- Phone:
- 07718031241
- Email:
- writetobamne@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window