LYMINGTON & BROCKENHURST LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Branch of Lions Clubs International
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
No other names
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.94k | £5.81k | £588 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.98k | £10.06k | £4.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 16 July 2020 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 16 July 2020 | 77 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 07 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
1.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CLUB ARE SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ENGLAND & WALES, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR: 1.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP BY: 1.1.1.1 PROMOTING THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP; 1.1.1.2 ENCOURAGING MEMBERS TO TAKE AN ACTIVE INTEREST IN THE CIVIC, CULTURAL, SOCIAL AND MORAL WELFARE OF THE COMMUNITY; 1.1.1.3 PROVIDING A FORUM FOR THE OPEN DISCUSSION OF ALL MATTERS OF PUBLIC INTEREST; PROVIDED THAT PARTISAN POLITICS AND SECTARIAN RELIGION SHALL NOT BE DEBATED BY MEMBERS; 1.1.1.4 ENCOURAGING SERVICE-MINDED PEOPLE TO SERVE THEIR COMMUNITY WITHOUT PERSONAL REWARD AND ENCOURAGING THE PROMOTION OF HIGH ETHICAL STANDARDS IN COMMERCE, INDUSTRY, PROFESSIONS, PUBLIC WORKS AND PRIVATE ENDEAVOURS; 1.1.1.5 SUPPORTING YOUTH TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; 1.1.2 PROMOTING THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ASSOCIATING WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF PEOPLE IN LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES; 1.1.3 PROMOTING VOLUNTEERING; 1.1.4 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING HUMANITARIAN AID AND DISASTER RELIEF; 1.1.5 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES BY PREVENTING AVOIDABLE BLINDNESS, ASSISTING DISABLED PEOPLE TO LEAD INDEPENDENT LIVES OR HELPING TO PREVENT OR MANAGE HEALTH ISSUES; 1.1.6 PROMOTING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; AND/OR 1.1.7 PROMOTING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window