SHAAREI TEFILLAH TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 1181106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

As detailed in the charity objects

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £177,493
Total expenditure: £139,306

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 December 2018: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHAIM GRUNFELD Chair 18 May 2019
None on record
Jechiel Sieradzki Trustee 07 February 2024
None on record
EMANUEL POLLAK Trustee 18 May 2018
THE Y.D. CHARITABLE FUND
Received: 227 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £29.48k £86.76k £157.64k £377.54k £177.49k
Total expenditure £31.39k £28.17k £37.15k £158.85k £139.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £9.58k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 10 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 10 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 06 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 06 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 28 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 28 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 28 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 28 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 28 May 2021 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 28 May 2021 58 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Haffner Hoff Ltd
Parkgates
Bury New Road
Prestwich
MANCHESTER
M25 0TL
Phone:
02036756972
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available