THE OLLERTON VILLAGE JUBILEE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To manage and maintain the Ollerton Village Jubilee Hall for the benefit and use of the inhabitants of the atea.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 09 September 1982: Standard registration
- OLLERTON JUBILEE HALL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN RAGSDALE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Susan Woodward | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Lee | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Norman Barrows | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Bentley | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER DAVIES | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Turner | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL MOUNSEY | Trustee | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ARNOLD | Trustee | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN REDDINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SANDRA THORBURN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN EDWARD COPPIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.63k | £26.74k | £30.41k | £18.10k | £15.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.21k | £29.16k | £9.02k | £17.06k | £34.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.14k | N/A | £19.05k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 5 AUGUST 1982
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THAT PART OF THE PARISH OF OLLERTON IN NOTTINGHAMSHIRE WHICH IS DELINEATED AND EDGED RED ON THE PLAN ANNEXED TO THE CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF OLLERTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 HAWKHILL CLOSE
OLLERTON
NEWARK
NG22 9AW
- Phone:
- 01623822444
- Email:
- johnwrichards1943@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window