Accounts and annual returns BERMUDA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1180571
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 January 2025 352 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2025 365 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2025 730 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 April 2022 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2025 1095 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 May 2021 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 May 2021 93 days late Download Open in new window